+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/02/14
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 3/31/2014
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
April 2, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 1
March 31, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor