+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 86, Nays 0, PNV 1
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 5/3/21
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 3 for 4/29/2021
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
May 3, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 86
- Present/NV: 1
April 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor