+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 28, Nays 0
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/30/2019
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
April 30, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 28
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor