+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 7
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 1/23/2020
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 1/22/2020
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
January 23, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 7
January 22, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor