+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 2
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for for 3-12-18
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 3/8/2018
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 89
March 8, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 29
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor