+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 2
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/06/14
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- R/S Adopted v.v.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 6, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor