+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (43)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 87, Nays 4, PNV 1
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/24/2014
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/20/2014
- Reset on Next Regular cal.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/17/2014
- Reset on Reg cal. fpr 3/17/14
- Passed on 1st Reading
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/13/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/6/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/4/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/26/2014
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 2/26/2014
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/19/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 2/19/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/5/2014
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 24, Nays 6, PNV 1
- Passed S. on 3rd Reading
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/28/2013
- Passed S. on 2nd Reading
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/27/2013
- Passed S. on 1st Reading
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/25/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for adoption by S. Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Gov. Comm. to 3/19/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for adoption, by S. Jud. Comm., ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm.
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/27/2013
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/27/2013
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/26/2013
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/26/2013
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/19/2013
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud. Comm.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (7)
March 24, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
March 6, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 4, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE
February 26, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE
March 28, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 19, 2013: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 9
February 27, 2013: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor