+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 1
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 5/1/19
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 28, Nays 0
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/30/2019
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
May 1, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 1
April 30, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 28
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor