+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 91, Nays 0
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/6/13
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 2/4/2013
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
February 6, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 3
February 4, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor