+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 81, Nays 0, PNV 1
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/3/14
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 2/27/2014
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 81
- Present/NV: 1
February 27, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 30