+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 1, PNV 0
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/28/21
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/26/2021
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
April 28, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 1
April 26, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 30
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor