+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/20/14
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 2/13/2014
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
February 20, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
February 13, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 33