+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. 2 for 4/30/19
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/29/2019
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
On April 17, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 04/22/02
+ − Votes (4)
April 30, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
April 30, 2019: HOUSE FLOOR SESSION: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 32
April 29, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
April 29, 2019: SEN. FLOOR SESSION: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor