+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. concurred in H. am. 1
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 2/24/2014
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Concurred as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0611)
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/13/2014
- Objected to on Consent Calendar.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/10/14
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 2/5/2014
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0611
Amendment 1-0 to SJR0552
+ − Votes (3)
February 24, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1
- Yeas: 30
February 13, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED MOTION TO CONCUR
- Yeas: 94
February 5, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor