+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/31/2014
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/27/2014
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 2/18/2014
- Ref. to Education Committee
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 2/6/2014
- Rec. for adoption by S. Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm.
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/4/2014
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (5)
March 31, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 1
March 27, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
February 18, 2014: EDUCATION COMMITTEE
February 6, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
February 4, 2014: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor