+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. 2 for 4/23/19
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/22/2019
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
April 23, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor