+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/10/16
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 3/7/2016
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 10, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 1
March 7, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor