+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for for 2-1-18
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 1/31/2018
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
February 1, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
January 31, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor