+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 1/29/14
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 1/27/2014
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
January 29, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 1
January 27, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor