+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/16/2014
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2014
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/1/2014
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Ref. to Education Committee
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 27, Nays 3
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/17/2014
- S. Reset on Cal. for 3/17/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/13/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for adoption by S. Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2014
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (5)
April 16, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
April 15, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
April 1, 2014: EDUCATION COMMITTEE
March 17, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
March 5, 2014: S. ED. COMM.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor