+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/22/18
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 2/17/2016
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
February 22, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
February 17, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 33
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor