+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
- Concurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 1/23/14
- Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 1/22/2014
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
January 23, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
January 22, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 30
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor