+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for for 1/18/18
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 1/17/2018
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
January 18, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
January 17, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 29
+ − Sponsor
Johnson
Type:
Primary Sponsor