+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 82, Nays 0, PNV 0
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 5/10/17
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 5/9/2017
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
May 10, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 82
May 9, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor