+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for for 1-18-19
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Passed on Second Consideration, Held on desk pending committee appointments
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 1/10/2019
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
January 18, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 1
January 10, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsors (2)
White
Type:
Primary Sponsor