+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 88, Nays 0
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. 3 for 4/19/13
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Intro., P1C.
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 4/19/2013
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
April 19, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
April 19, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 88
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor