+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 1
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. 2 for 4/22/19
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/18/2019
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
April 18, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 33
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor