+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/6/2017
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Calendar Committee
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
April 6, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor