+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 5/9/2017
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 5/8/2017
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 89
May 8, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor