+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/17/19
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/15/2019
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
April 17, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 97
April 15, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor