+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 1/21/16
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 28, Nays 0
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 1/20/2016
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Calendar Committee
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On December 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
January 21, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
January 20, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 28
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor