+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/25/2021
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
February 25, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor