+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/4/13
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 1/31/2013
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C Held on desk pending committee appointments
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On December 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
February 4, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 2
January 31, 2013: FLOOR VOTE:
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor