+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
- Adopted, Ayes 27, Nays 0
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/7/2013
- Rec. for adoption by S. Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm.
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/5/2013
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 3/5/2013
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 2/26/2013
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 2/26/2013
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 2/19/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. F,W&M Comm.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 27
March 5, 2013: S. FW&M COMM.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor