+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/9/2015
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/5/2015
On January 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Education Committee
- Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments.
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 6
March 5, 2015: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 6
March 5, 2015: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor