+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 1
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2016
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/7/2016
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/30/2016
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/22/2016
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
- Ref. to Health Committee
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/22/2016
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/16/2016
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (6)
April 13, 2016: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 13, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 1
March 30, 2016: HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 22, 2016: HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
February 22, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 11
February 16, 2016: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor