+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for #4 for 4/22/15
- Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 5 calendar for 4/22/2015
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
April 22, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
April 22, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93