+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/8/21
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/5/2021
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 87
April 5, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor