+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/18/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/12/2013
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Ref. to State Government Committee
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 2/25/2013
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for adoption by S. Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 2/12/2013
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. F,W&M Comm.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (5)
March 18, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 2
March 14, 2013: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 12, 2013: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE
February 25, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 30
February 12, 2013: S. FW&M COMM.
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor