+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 73, Nays 0, PNV 5
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 5/1/17
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/27/2017
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
May 1, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 73
April 27, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 30
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor