+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/8/19
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/4/2019
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
April 4, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor