+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
March 29, 2017: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor