+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 3 for 4/5/2021
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/31/2021
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
April 26, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
April 5, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
March 31, 2021: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9