+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/20/15
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Rules Suspended, Adopted voice vote
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
April 20, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor