+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/14/2015
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
April 14, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor