+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/13/2017
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/8/2017
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
February 13, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 8
February 13, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR
- Yeas: 98
February 8, 2017: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor