+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/1/19
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/28/2019
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
April 1, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
March 28, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 30
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor