+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 90, Nays 0
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. 2 for 4/17/13
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 4/17/2013
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
April 17, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
April 17, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor