+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On January 17, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 1/17/15
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Rules Suspended, Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments.
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 1/16/2015
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
January 17, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
January 16, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor