+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 1
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/17/17
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 27, Nays 0
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/13/2017
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
April 17, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 89
April 13, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 27
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor